This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/22/2020 at 04:10:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HURST, SHAWONA DENISE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HURST, SHAWONA DENISE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********95 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HURST, SHAWONA DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: WHITE, REBECCA IVY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED FROM 2020MM001661 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK NOTE-PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE TRANSFERRED FROM 562020MM001661 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002295 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 09/23/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5886795 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 09/10/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/31/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020MM001661 A

    Read MoreRead Less