This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2020 at 06:45:07 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HORTELANO, GABRIELLE ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HORTELANO, GABRIELLE ROBERTS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VAUGHN, DAN L and BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VAUGHN, DAN L

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HORTELANO, GABRIELLE ROBERTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA

LIBBY, JONATHON

Defendant Attorneys

FLEISCHMAN, JACK ALBERT

BARLOW, RICHARD A

 

Court Documents

MOTION ( V )

12/31/2019: MOTION ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4357.1985 / 4651749) ( V )

12/11/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4357.1985 / 4651749) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

12/9/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

12/9/2019: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

AMENDED IN-COURT NOTES ( V )

12/4/2019: AMENDED IN-COURT NOTES ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/14/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

7/11/2019: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY ( V )

7/9/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/9/2019: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

MOTION TO SEVER ( V )

7/1/2019: MOTION TO SEVER ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AMENDED) ( V )

6/28/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AMENDED) ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

6/27/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

5/14/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/19/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/2/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V ) ( V )

6/20/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V ) ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

6/5/2018: BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

6/5/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: DRUG TRUST FUND CO; Description: County Drug Abuse Program; Assessment: $125.00; Paid: $125.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP CF; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $200.00; Paid: $200.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $41.04; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $8.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: CF COST; Description: CF Court Cost; Assessment: $418.00; Paid: $396.46; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $21.54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000000304; Applied Amount; $762.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $762.50 RECEIPT #2020000000304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/01/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF001477 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND IS15K414754 POSTED $15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND IS30K221466 POSTED $30,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE VAUGHN, DAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/30/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF001465 A

    Read MoreRead Less