This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 12/17/2020 at 12:07:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HECKMAN, ASHLEY LYNN

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HECKMAN, ASHLEY LYNN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELANGER, ROBERT E and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********85 B

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELANGER, ROBERT E

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HECKMAN, ASHLEY LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

 

Court Documents

CLERK CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

10/16/2020: CLERK CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

TRANSFER ORDER ( V )

10/16/2020: TRANSFER ORDER ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

10/15/2020: IN-COURT NOTES

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

10/15/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

ORDER FOR RELEASE ( V )

10/15/2020: ORDER FOR RELEASE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/15/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

10/15/2020: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/2/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

10/1/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

10/1/2020: IN-COURT NOTES

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

9/22/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

9/18/2020: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION ( V )

9/18/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

9/4/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/3/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2020
  • DocketAttorney TIFFANY ANNA HOGAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2020
  • DocketAttorney LINDSAY CHRISTINA STROKE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 9; Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (893.147.1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER ORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingEvent: DRUG COURT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: PLEA / ADMISSION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 8; Description: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE (893.13.6A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002085 B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002086 A

    Read MoreRead Less