This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/14/2023 at 07:28:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HARRISON, DANIELLE RENE

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARRISON, DANIELLE RENE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YACUCCI, PHILIP J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********98 B

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YACUCCI, PHILIP J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HARRISON, DANIELLE RENE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4237.32 / 4535445) ( V )

2/27/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4237.32 / 4535445) ( V )

NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

9/12/2018: NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

9/12/2018: NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4170.2742 / 4471664) ( V )

8/20/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4170.2742 / 4471664) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

8/17/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4169.983 / 4470108) ( V )

8/15/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4169.983 / 4470108) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

8/14/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

8/9/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

8/8/2018: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

7/30/2018: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

BONDSMAN OFF BOND FILED ( V )

7/23/2018: BONDSMAN OFF BOND FILED ( V )

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

7/19/2018: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION ( V )

7/18/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

7/13/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

7/13/2018: BOND RECEIVED ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

7/13/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V ) ( V )

7/11/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V ) ( V )

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney AMBER MOSELEY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP IN FILE SlcLGBSPlacements_03142019.txt - BALANCE DUE $450.72.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4237.32 / 4535445) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 10/03/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 10/03/2018 - FAILED TO PAY $450.72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR; Judge: YACUCCI, PHILIP J; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4170.2742 / 4471664) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V ) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SMARTT, NIRLAINE TALLANDIER ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V ) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V ) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V ) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE VAUGHN, DAN L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/21/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF001667 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant