This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2020 at 05:29:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HARRIS, LECEDRIC PRENTICE

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARRIS, LECEDRIC PRENTICE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VAUGHN, DAN L and BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********94 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VAUGHN, DAN L

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HARRIS, LECEDRIC PRENTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LIBBY, JONATHON

WHITE, BRANDON ALEXANDER EDISON

Defendant Attorneys

CELIDONIO, MARY

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

MURACH, ARMAND

RHODEBACK, MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

IN-COURT NOTES

8/9/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

8/2/2018: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

7/13/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/9/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/9/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

6/29/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

6/27/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

6/20/2018: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

ORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION TO DECLARE COURT RECORDS CONFIDENTIAL AND FOR AN ORDER OF DISCLOSURE TO THE DEFENSE ( V )

6/20/2018: ORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION TO DECLARE COURT RECORDS CONFIDENTIAL AND FOR AN ORDER OF DISCLOSURE TO THE DEFENSE ( V )

MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS ( V )

6/18/2018: MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

6/13/2018: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

6/12/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

5/24/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

5/24/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

5/24/2018: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL DOCKET; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: JOHNSON, ANTHONY - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CF001394 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. HARRIS, LECEDRIC PRENTICE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/19/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketTRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 03/16/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL DOCKET; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: TRIAL DOCKET: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT WITH APD S. COUZENS. ASA J. LIBBY WAS PRESENT. DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR TRIAL DOCKET ON 03/16/2020 AT 9:00 AM. RETURN CARD GIVEN. AP/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL DOCKET; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY STIPULATED MOTION PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketTRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 02/17/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE VAUGHN, DAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/24/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF001394 A

    Read MoreRead Less