This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/18/2021 at 05:11:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HARRIS, JEROME ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARRIS, JEROME ANTHONY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********51 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HARRIS, JEROME ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION ( V )

10/7/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

9/18/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO 2020CT001837 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE REVOKED-HABITUAL OF (322.34.5); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Transferred

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - ADJH67E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002251 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less