This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2021 at 13:56:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HARRIS, JAMES EMMANUEL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARRIS, JAMES EMMANUEL. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HARRIS, JAMES EMMANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/10/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

1/21/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

ORDER ( V )

1/15/2021: ORDER ( V )

ARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

12/15/2020: ARREST REPORT - NOT INITIATING CASE ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

12/15/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

12/15/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/15/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

12/15/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

12/15/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/11/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

12/11/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED-TELETYPED ( V )

12/4/2020: BOND RECEIVED-TELETYPED ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

12/4/2020: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/4/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/4/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/2/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

10/30/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SNAPP, MIKE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002259 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. HARRIS, JAMES EMMANUEL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/10/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 03/09/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT.PRESENCE WAIVED. APD A.ELLIOTT AND ASA L.STROKE WAS PRESENT VIA ZOOM. DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 03/09/2021 AT 9:00AM. KA/DB/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $31500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202014019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002259 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROKE, LINDSAY CHRISTINA