This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/17/2021 at 12:10:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HAMDAN, NADER SAMEER

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HAMDAN, NADER SAMEER. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********43 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HAMDAN, NADER SAMEER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA

KAWECKI, TODD ANDREW

 

Court Documents

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

10/2/2020: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

10/1/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/1/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/1/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/30/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

9/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NO INFORMATION ( V )

9/30/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/21/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAttorney TODD ANDREW KAWECKI - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketLETTER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: KAWECKI, TODD ANDREW - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002243 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. HAMDAN, NADER SAMEER - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NIF-9/30/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: KAWECKI, TODD ANDREW ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: WASHINGTON, JENNIFER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002243 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. HAMDAN, NADER SAMEER - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-10/1/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND U620797345 (806.13.1B3) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND U620797345 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND U620797346 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002243 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN, TIFFANY ANNA