This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/28/2021 at 13:27:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GRAVES, TIFFANY MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRAVES, TIFFANY MICHELLE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELANGER, ROBERT E and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********48 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELANGER, ROBERT E

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GRAVES, TIFFANY MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIBBY, JONATHON

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIOTT, ALEXANDER C

MALLONEE, BRIAN HOBBS

 

Court Documents

TRANSCRIPT - MOTION TO ADMIT DEFENDANT INTO DRUG COURT & CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING ON DECEMBER 3, 2020 ( V )

1/15/2021: TRANSCRIPT - MOTION TO ADMIT DEFENDANT INTO DRUG COURT & CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING ON DECEMBER 3, 2020 ( V )

ORDER OF INDIGENCY AND APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

1/5/2021: ORDER OF INDIGENCY AND APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

RESPONSE ( V )

12/30/2020: RESPONSE ( V )

MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL FOR APPEAL ( V )

12/30/2020: MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL FOR APPEAL ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED) ( V )

12/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED) ( V )

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK ( V )

12/30/2020: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK ( V )

CERTIFIED NOTICE OF APPEAL ( V )

12/18/2020: CERTIFIED NOTICE OF APPEAL ( V )

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENCE ( V )

12/18/2020: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENCE ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION

12/11/2020: ORDER OF PROBATION

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

12/7/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

12/3/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

MOTION ( V )

11/20/2020: MOTION ( V )

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

11/19/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

11/9/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

11/6/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/14/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: DRUG COURT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDRUG COURT HEARING SET FOR 03/04/2021 AT 1:45 PM IN 1D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: LEVIN, STEVEN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: DRUG COURT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DRUG COURT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT VIA ZOOM VIDEO. CASE SET FOR ADDITIONAL REVIEW ON 03/04/2021 AT 1:45 PM. AP/DB/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDRUG COURT HEARING SET FOR 02/04/2021 AT 1:45 PM IN 1D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: LEVIN, STEVEN J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: DRUG COURT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DRUG COURT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT VIA ZOOM VIDEO. CASE SET FOR ADDITIONAL REVIEW ON 02/04/2021 AT 1:45 PM. AP/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DCA ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND U3120801331 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND U3120801332 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND U3120801560 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002248 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIBBY, JONATHON