This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 05:19:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GORDON, KATHERINA HORTENSE

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GORDON, KATHERINA HORTENSE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDRIKS, JEFFREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GORDON, KATHERINA HORTENSE

 

Court Documents

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT

11/28/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT

NOTICE ON DEMAND

11/29/2022: NOTICE ON DEMAND

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/1/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/5/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/6/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NO INFORMATION

12/13/2022: NO INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: NO INFORMATION OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • ChargeCharges; Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1A1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: KEARNEY, ELISE MARIE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: NELSON, JENNIFER A ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: BARATTINI, MICHAEL PAUL ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 12/15/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 12/14/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022MM002460 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant