This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/20/2023 at 12:03:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GILLISPIE, RICHARD DALE

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GILLISPIE, RICHARD DALE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********36 B

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GILLISPIE, RICHARD DALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REID, KATY ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorney

BARNES, CLIFFORD H

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO TRANSPORT

4/18/2023: ORDER TO TRANSPORT

MOTION TO TRANSPORT

4/18/2023: MOTION TO TRANSPORT

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/14/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

COURT MINUTES

4/12/2023: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

3/10/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/6/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

COURT MINUTES

3/3/2023: COURT MINUTES

COURT MINUTES

3/2/2023: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/2/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

AFFIDAVIT

2/27/2023: AFFIDAVIT

MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY, OR SET BOND

2/27/2023: MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY, OR SET BOND

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

2/16/2023: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/20/2023: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION

1/19/2023: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

12/20/2022: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

12/20/2022: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT

12/16/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: BARNES, CLIFFORD H - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CF003236 B, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. GILLISPIE, RICHARD DALE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/14/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 05/24/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMOTION HEARING SET FOR 04/20/2023 AT 10:15 AM IN 3A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE HEISEY, MICHAEL C: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: BARNES, CLIFFORD H ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/16/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CF003241 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less