Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:21:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. FRANKLIN, CORLIYAH CORSANDRA

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FRANKLIN, CORLIYAH CORSANDRA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDRIKS, JEFFREY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********16 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FRANKLIN, CORLIYAH CORSANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE, ROBERT E JR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

7/14/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

7/13/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

6/24/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RETURN MAIL

6/23/2020: RETURN MAIL

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

6/16/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

6/16/2020: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

1/29/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

1/24/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

12/17/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - A; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - A SET FOR 09/14/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - A; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL - A: DEFENDANT AND ATTORNEY WERE NOT PRESENT, ASA ROBERT E. STONE JR WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. ASA PRESENT VIA ZOOM. JUDGE WAIVED DEFT''S PRESENCE. CASE CONTINUED BY THE COURT. CONTINUED FOR: DOCKET CALL - A: NEXT COURT DATE: 9/14/2020 09:00 AM WITH JUDGE HENDRIKS J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - A SET FOR 07/13/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020000020538 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2019MM002916 A VIA CORE030320.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR; Judge: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, (SELF REPRESENTED). ASA ROBERT E. STONE JR WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. DEFT ENTERED DPP. THE NEXT COURT DATE IS 8/13/2020 @ 2PM. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 NO VERDICT RENDERED : .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STONE, ROBERT E JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 01/29/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 2E/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/17/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019MM002916 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE, ROBERT E JR