This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2020 at 11:48:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. FRANK, JAMIE LYNN

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FRANK, JAMIE LYNN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********64 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FRANK, JAMIE LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN, ALISSA R

DAY, JENNIFER LYNNE

Defendant Attorneys

BERNARD, PAUL BARNETT

PACKARD, MARK

DOMINGUEZ, LIZET

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4223.1045 / 4520741) ( V )

1/16/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4223.1045 / 4520741) ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

1/7/2019: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

12/27/2018: NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

RETURN MAIL ( V )

12/3/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4206.521 / 4504408) ( V )

11/27/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4206.521 / 4504408) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4206.514 / 4504407) ( V )

11/27/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4206.514 / 4504407) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

11/20/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )

11/20/2018: ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )

COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

11/19/2018: COMMITMENT TO COUNTY JAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/2/2018: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

11/1/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/12/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/3/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

7/9/2018: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

7/5/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

6/21/2018: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

6/21/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH PENN CREDIT IN FILE penncredit_05232019.txt - BALANCE DUE $949.93.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 01/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 01/17/2019 - FAILED TO PAY $949.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4223.1045 / 4520741) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: PDFEES CF; Description: Public Defender Fees; Assessment: $100.75; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $100.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: DRUG TRUST FUND CO; Description: County Drug Abuse Program; Assessment: $125.91; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $125.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 1; Code: COP CF; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $201.45; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $201.45

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PACKARD, MARK ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/21/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF001664 A

    Read MoreRead Less