This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:04:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DUNLAP, RAVAN DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DUNLAP, RAVAN DANIELLE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********98 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DUNLAP, RAVAN DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

Defendant Attorney

HOOPER, STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/12/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NO INFORMATION ( V )

10/9/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V )

NOLLE PROSEQUI ( V )

10/6/2020: NOLLE PROSEQUI ( V )

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

10/6/2020: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

10/5/2020: INFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/5/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/5/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/5/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

10/2/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NOLLE PROSEQUI ( V )

10/2/2020: NOLLE PROSEQUI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/2/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

10/2/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/30/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

10/1/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/30/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/25/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HAMRICK, DONALAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002298 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. DUNLAP, RAVAN DANIELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-10/12/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5907264 (499.03.3) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 3; Description: POSSESSION OF CERTAIN DRUGS WITH TINET TO SELL, DISPENSE, OR DELIVER (499.03.3); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO 2020CT001809 A

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: HOOPER, STEPHEN CHARLES ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5907263 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5907264 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002298 A

    Read MoreRead Less