This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 20:09:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DAVIS, DE'VONTE ALFRED

Case Summary

On 10/05/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS, DE'VONTE ALFRED. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SWEET, GARY L and ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********02 A

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SWEET, GARY L

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DAVIS, DE'VONTE ALFRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, ALISSA R

Defendant Attorneys

MACRAE, PATRICK EMERSON

PACKARD, MARK

CHINQUINA, DONALD A

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CORRECT SENTENCE ( V )

1/29/2019: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CORRECT SENTENCE ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

9/14/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

8/6/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

7/19/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

JURY VERDICT ( V )

7/19/2018: JURY VERDICT ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/19/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

7/18/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/17/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/12/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

7/2/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

6/27/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

6/4/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/7/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

LETTER ( V )

11/13/2017: LETTER ( V )

ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

11/7/2017: ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

10/25/2017: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

INFORMATION ( V )

10/25/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

REQUEST ( V )

10/16/2017: REQUEST ( V )

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INQUIRY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SWEET, GARY L - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CF002702 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. DAVIS, DE'VONTE ALFRED - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MTNPC-10/16/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR POST CONV RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF FILED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INQUIRY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT SAO, LISA B, TINA REL 2017CF002702 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. DAVIS, DE'VONTE ALFRED - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFORDDMPCREL-8/9/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION FOR POST-CONVICTION RELIEF ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM-WITNESS STATEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/05/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF002702 A

    Read MoreRead Less