This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/27/2021 at 15:06:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DAVIS, DANIELLE ALYSSIA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS, DANIELLE ALYSSIA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********41 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DAVIS, DANIELLE ALYSSIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

Defendant Attorneys

DOMINGUEZ, LIZET

GROSE, CHARLOTTE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/18/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

2/18/2021: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

2/15/2021: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

1/25/2021: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/4/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/23/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/28/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/22/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

10/22/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/12/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/9/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/8/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

10/8/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/21/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SUAREZ, ANDREA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002241 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. DAVIS, DANIELLE ALYSSIA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/18/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 03/16/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: GROSE, CHARLOTTE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5877453 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5877454 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5852157 POSTED $2,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002241 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSE, CHARLOTTE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINGUEZ, LIZET