Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 06/18/2021 at 12:23:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DANIELS, JOSEPH TODD

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DANIELS, JOSEPH TODD. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HENDRIKS, JEFFREY and MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********67 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DANIELS, JOSEPH TODD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

Defendant Attorneys

COUZENS, STEVEN EDWARD

ARRIETA, MANUEL EDUARDO

ALONZO, KATHARINE ANNE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

6/8/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER PLACING DEFENDANT INTO MENTAL HEALTH COURT ( V )

5/17/2021: ORDER PLACING DEFENDANT INTO MENTAL HEALTH COURT ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

5/3/2021: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4600.1646 / 4855517) ( V )

4/29/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4600.1646 / 4855517) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4600.771 / 4855250) ( V )

4/28/2021: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4600.771 / 4855250) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

4/28/2021: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

4/26/2021: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

4/6/2021: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/25/2021: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/25/2021: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/15/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

3/1/2021: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/11/2021: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

3/9/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

3/2/2021: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

3/1/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: MENTAL HEALTH COURT; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH COURT SET FOR 06/28/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 1D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: ALONZO, KATHARINE ANNE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: MENTAL HEALTH COURT; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: MENTAL HEALTH COURT: DEFENDANT WAS PRESENT IN OPEN COURT ON THE "A" TEAM. CASE SET FOR ADDITIONAL REVIEW ON 06/28/21 AT 02:30 PM. KEB/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH COURT SET FOR 06/07/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 1D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: MENTAL HEALTH COURT; Judge: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: MENTAL HEALTH COURT: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT. CASE SET FOR ADDITIONAL REVIEW ON 06/07/21 AT 02:30 PM. KEB/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH COURT SET FOR 05/24/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 1D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL: (IN JAIL). APPEARED VIA JAIL VIDEO. WITH APD MANUEL E. ARRIETAVIA TELECONFERENCE . ASA PAIGE M. FARACH WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE VIA TELECONFERENCE. DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE GRANTED BY JUDGE. CONTINUED FOR: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL: NEXT COURT DATE: 3/25/2021 01:30 PM WITH JUDGE HENDRIKS J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 03/11/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/01/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000367 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, REBECCA IVY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL