This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/03/2021 at 05:10:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DAMES, DY'QUAN JAMAL EDWARD

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAMES, DY'QUAN JAMAL EDWARD. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DAMES, DY'QUAN JAMAL EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

Defendant Attorneys

ZISKINDER, STEVEN

KAPLAN, DAVID A

RADCLIFFE, GABRIELLE LUCIE ANTONIA

GROSE, CHARLOTTE

MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/17/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

COMPLAINT FILED (JV) ( V ) ( V )

1/13/2021: COMPLAINT FILED (JV) ( V ) ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/9/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

3/4/2021: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

2/11/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/11/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

2/11/2021: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/10/2021: CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

2/10/2021: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

2/5/2021: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

2/4/2021: CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AND APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

1/21/2021: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AND APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

1/21/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V ) ( V )

1/21/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V ) ( V )

SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

12/30/2020: SEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

12/23/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )

DETENTION ORDER ( V ) ( V )

12/23/2020: DETENTION ORDER ( V ) ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

12/23/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CF000306 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. DAMES, DY'QUAN JAMAL EDWARD - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-3/17/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 05/18/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL- DEFENDANT DID NOT APPEAR IN COURT (IN CUSTODY). ATTY E MOSHER AND ASA S SCOTT APPEARED THRU ZOOM. DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE WAS GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 05/18/2021 AT 1:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSPEEDY TRIAL WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketLETTER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: WELLS, CARLOS LEE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDETENTION HEARING SET FOR 12/23/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN 1A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MEADOWS, ROBERT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDJJ FACE SHEET FOR SCORING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDETENTION HEARING SET FOR 12/23/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN 1A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MEADOWS, ROBERT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MEADOWS, ROBERT B: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MEADOWS, ROBERT B: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/23/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CJ000707 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDJJ ASSESSMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/23/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CJ000708 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN