This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/27/2021 at 15:00:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CULBERTH, SHELDON TAVARIUS

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CULBERTH, SHELDON TAVARIUS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********45 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CULBERTH, SHELDON TAVARIUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

Defendant Attorneys

DOMINGUEZ, LIZET

GROSE, CHARLOTTE

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/21/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DERTES, JOSHUA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002245 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. CULBERTH, SHELDON TAVARIUS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/18/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 03/16/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: GROSE, CHARLOTTE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: DOMINGUEZ, LIZET ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSE1543296 POSTED $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSE1543295 POSTED $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002245 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLOMAN, FELICIA