This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 10:19:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CRENSHAW, LATOYA NICOLE

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CRENSHAW, LATOYA NICOLE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********40 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CRENSHAW, LATOYA NICOLE

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

5/18/2021: DEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ADDRESS FORM ( V )

3/9/2021: PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ADDRESS FORM ( V )

DEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

10/9/2020: DEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

AFFIDAVIT REINSTATE DRIVER LICENSE CC- WINDOW

3/11/2020: AFFIDAVIT REINSTATE DRIVER LICENSE CC- WINDOW

PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V )

3/11/2020: PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V )

DEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

1/27/2020: DEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4351.2487 / 4646835) ( V )

11/27/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4351.2487 / 4646835) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

11/26/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

11/25/2019: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

11/21/2019: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

11/19/2019: NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

11/19/2019: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V )

11/19/2019: PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

11/19/2019: COURT MINUTES ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/19/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/25/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

10/22/2019: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

9/10/2019: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH PENN CREDIT IN FILE penncredit_11182021.txt - BALANCE DUE $113.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 06/09/2021 - FAILED TO PAY $113.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY OR SET FOR COURT REQUIRED BY: 06/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION CLEARANCE SENT TO TCATS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE UPDATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 01/14/2021 COMPLETED 4/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ADDRESS FORM ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $250.00 RECEIPT #2021000019060

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 01/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC25086068 POSTED $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $1000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 1905620183590

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/01/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018MM001040 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant