This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 18:25:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. COWGILL, ALEXANDRA MARIE

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COWGILL, ALEXANDRA MARIE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VAUGHN, DAN L and MCCANN, JAMES W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********91 B

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VAUGHN, DAN L

MCCANN, JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COWGILL, ALEXANDRA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BALDREE, LINDA KAY

SMARTT, NIRLAINE TALLANDIER

Defendant Attorney

KAWECKI, TODD ANDREW

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4255.255 / 4552832) ( V )

4/11/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4255.255 / 4552832) ( V )

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

2/15/2018: UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS - Recorded (Other.4098.245 / 4401931) ( V )

2/15/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS - Recorded (Other.4098.245 / 4401931) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

2/13/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )

2/9/2018: ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

2/7/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

2/7/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/16/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

1/10/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

10/4/2017: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

LETTER ( V )

10/4/2017: LETTER ( V )

TRANSFER CASE LETTER

9/26/2017: TRANSFER CASE LETTER

INFORMATION

9/20/2017: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/24/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

8/22/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

8/21/2017: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

8/21/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

8/21/2017: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP IN FILE SlcLGBSPlacements_08222019.txt - BALANCE DUE $758.58.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4255.255 / 4552832) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 02/27/2019 - FAILED TO PAY $735.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PARTIAL PAY; Description: Partial Payment Fee; Assessment: $25.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION CLEARANCE SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000000654; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/21/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF002289 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less