This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 06:45:40 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CORWIN, JEFFERY KENNETH

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CORWIN, JEFFERY KENNETH. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********40 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CORWIN, JEFFERY KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAY, JENNIFER LYNNE

Defendant Attorney

RUIZ, ROBERT JASON

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION ( V )

8/21/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/16/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

8/15/2017: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

8/14/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

8/10/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

8/10/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

8/10/2017: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

8/2/2017: WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED TO 2017CF002130 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketPURSUANT TO RULE 2.430, COURT RECORD FILE HAS BEEN DESTROYED OR DISPOSED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: DAY, JENNIFER LYNNE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 4; Description: POSSESSION OF MORPHINE (893.13.6A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 3; Description: SALE OR DELIVERY OF OXYMORPHONE (893.13.1A1); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: SALE, DELIVERY, OR POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO SELL OR DELIVER MORPHINE (893.13.1A1); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: UNLAWFUL USE OF TWO-WAY COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE (934.215); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: RUIZ, ROBERT JASON ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $185000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 1905620171360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/02/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF002140 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less