This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/23/2020 at 01:21:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CORIGLIANO, EVELYN ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CORIGLIANO, EVELYN ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********17 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CORIGLIANO, EVELYN ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAY, JENNIFER LYNNE

BRUIN, JASON JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

BAJGER, JENNIFER I

MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

ORDER VACATING ORDER TO REVOKE DRIVER'S LICENSE ( V )

9/28/2018: ORDER VACATING ORDER TO REVOKE DRIVER'S LICENSE ( V )

ORDER RE: ISSUE OF DRIVER'S LICENSE(AMENDED) ( V )

9/28/2018: ORDER RE: ISSUE OF DRIVER'S LICENSE(AMENDED) ( V )

ORDER TO REINSTATE DRIVER LICENSE ( V )

9/12/2018: ORDER TO REINSTATE DRIVER LICENSE ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4174.2561 / 4475405) ( V )

8/29/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4174.2561 / 4475405) ( V )

ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )

8/13/2018: ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

6/29/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/11/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

10/10/2017: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

10/9/2017: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/5/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

8/28/2017: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

7/31/2017: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

7/31/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

7/28/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

7/19/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

7/12/2017: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

7/12/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000055425; Applied Amount; $47.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $47.81 RECEIPT #2019000055425

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000041559; Applied Amount; $120.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $120.19 RECEIPT #2019000041559

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000021640; Applied Amount; $192.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $192.31 RECEIPT #2019000021640

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000009838; Applied Amount; $144.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $144.23 RECEIPT #2019000009838

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2018000082539; Applied Amount; $192.31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $192.31 RECEIPT #2018000082539

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/12/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF001917 A

    Read MoreRead Less