This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/23/2020 at 04:03:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. COLE, DAVID JOHN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COLE, DAVID JOHN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********96 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COLE, DAVID JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

Defendant Attorney

DIAZ, WENDY LEE

 

Court Documents

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/5/2020: RETURN MAIL ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

9/10/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/23/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

9/22/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

9/10/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/9/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/9/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/9/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/9/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/8/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/8/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADHYSLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: WHITE, REBECCA IVY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED FROM 2020CT001592 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCITATION ADHYSLE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 09/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002296 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ALVAREZ, DIANA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CT001592 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COLE, DAVID JOHN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-9/23/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND 2020AA052176 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDRIVER LICENSE CHECK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 09/21/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CT001592 A

    Read MoreRead Less