This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 05:07:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. COGDELL, RAY ANTHONY JR

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COGDELL, RAY ANTHONY JR. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********14 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COGDELL, RAY ANTHONY JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

STONE, ROBERT E JR

Defendant Attorneys

MERSON, MICHELLE

ANTONACCI, ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

3/25/2021: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

INFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

3/18/2021: INFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/18/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/18/2021: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/16/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

3/15/2021: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/2/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/1/2021: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

3/1/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/1/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

1/29/2021: INFORMATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

1/11/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

1/11/2021: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

1/8/2021: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

1/8/2021: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 3C - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADJKJSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MERSON, MICHELLE; ANTONACCI, ALEXANDRA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021MM000214 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COGDELL, RAY ANTHONY JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: AMIF-3/18/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STONE, ROBERT E JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - A; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ANTONACCI, ALEXANDRA; DEPALMA, JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021MM000214 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COGDELL, RAY ANTHONY JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-3/18/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: ANTONACCI, ALEXANDRA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCITATION ADJKJSE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 01/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS3K443262 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS1K532386 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/08/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CF000086 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTONACCI, ALEXANDRA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Merson, Michelle