This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/17/2021 at 12:08:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. COBB, DERRICK DEMETRIUS

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COBB, DERRICK DEMETRIUS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********39 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

COBB, DERRICK D

COBB, DERRICK DEMETRIUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

HOOPER, STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

2/15/2021: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/28/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

1/7/2021: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/29/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/28/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

10/15/2020: CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

10/15/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

10/15/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/12/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/12/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

10/12/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

10/9/2020: CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

10/8/2020: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

9/21/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SUAREZ, ANDREA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002239 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COBB, DERRICK DEMETRIUS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-1/28/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 02/23/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SUAREZ, ANDREA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002239 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COBB, DERRICK DEMETRIUS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-12/29/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5852156 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5852155 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002239 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN