This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/19/2021 at 15:35:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CLARKE, MALIK JACQUES

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CLARKE, MALIK JACQUES. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********47 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

CLARKE, MALIK JAQUES

CLARKE, MALIK JACQUES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

Defendant Attorney

GRAVES, ALICE JULIA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

1/20/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/22/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

11/23/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

11/19/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/18/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/27/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

10/26/2020: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

10/26/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/12/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

10/12/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/7/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

10/6/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

10/6/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

9/21/2020: WARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

BOND RECEIVED - TELETYPE ( V )

9/22/2020: BOND RECEIVED - TELETYPE ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9/22/2020: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GRAVES, ALICE JULIA; BARNETT, SARAH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002247 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. CLARKE, MALIK JACQUES - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-12/22/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 02/24/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT, PRESENCE WAIVED. ATTY A. GRAVES AND ASA F. HOLLOMAN WERE PRESENT VIA ZOOM VIDEO. DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 02/24/2021 AT 9:00 AM. AP/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $7500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202014021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002247 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant