This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/21/2020 at 19:19:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CHILDS, LEONARD DWAYNE

Case Summary

On 03/07/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CHILDS, LEONARD DWAYNE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********32 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CHILDS, LEONARD DWAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, ALISSA R

Defendant Attorneys

BAJGER, JENNIFER I

RANDOLPH, CURTIS

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

CLERK ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE ( V )

12/7/2017: CLERK ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE ( V )

CERTIFIED NOTICE OF APPEAL ( V )

12/6/2017: CERTIFIED NOTICE OF APPEAL ( V )

ORDER STRIKING MOTION ( V )

11/22/2017: ORDER STRIKING MOTION ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

10/26/2017: IN-COURT NOTES

MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ( V )

10/25/2017: MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

10/19/2017: IN-COURT NOTES

IN-COURT NOTES

9/29/2017: IN-COURT NOTES

ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL DATE TERMINATING DISCOVERY,AND IMPOSEING PRETRIAL MOTION DEADLINES AFTER DEMAND OF SPEEDY TRIAL

9/27/2017: ORDER SETTING CALENDAR CALL DATE TERMINATING DISCOVERY,AND IMPOSEING PRETRIAL MOTION DEADLINES AFTER DEMAND OF SPEEDY TRIAL

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/16/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

7/7/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

7/6/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

7/5/2017: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

5/26/2017: CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

5/24/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

5/24/2017: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

DEMAND FOR SPEEDY TRIAL ( V )

5/17/2017: DEMAND FOR SPEEDY TRIAL ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

5/5/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

5/4/2017: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DCA ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: TRIAL DOCKET; Judge: SWEET, GARY L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: NOLLE PROSEQUI OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 3; Description: FELONY BATTERY - PRIOR CONVICTION (784.03.2); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: TAMPERING WITH WITNESS, VICTIM, OR INFORMANT (914.22.2B); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY BY STRANGULATION- PRIOR CONVICTION (784.041.2A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: RANDOLPH, CURTIS - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CF000632 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. CHILDS, LEONARD DWAYNE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NPF-2/1/2018"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $110000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 1702661

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/07/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF000632 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less