This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/18/2021 at 05:17:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CASTILLO-ALEJOS, ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CASTILLO-ALEJOS, ANTONIO. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********56 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CASTILLO-ALEJOS, ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

ORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

10/6/2020: ORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

WAIVER OF EXTRADITION ( V )

9/23/2020: WAIVER OF EXTRADITION ( V )

WAIVER ( V )

9/25/2020: WAIVER ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF EXTRADITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: FUGITIVE (941.02); Level: N; Degree: N; Disposition: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002256 A

    Read MoreRead Less