This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/25/2021 at 12:58:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CARSON, GREGORY J

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CARSON, GREGORY J. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********38 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CARSON, GREGORY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

Defendant Attorneys

ROSENBERG, REGAN M

MIRANDA, GINGER A

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/25/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

10/30/2020: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

10/22/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

10/12/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/12/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

9/23/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

7/29/2020: COURT MINUTES ( V )

DETENTION ORDER ( V )

7/6/2020: DETENTION ORDER ( V )

TAKE AND HOLD RETURNED SERVED ( V )

7/6/2020: TAKE AND HOLD RETURNED SERVED ( V )

ORDER TO TAKE INTO CUSTODY ( V )

6/30/2020: ORDER TO TAKE INTO CUSTODY ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

6/30/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

DELINQUENCY PETITION AMENDED ( V )

6/18/2020: DELINQUENCY PETITION AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/16/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/16/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

DELINQUENCY PETITION ( V )

6/15/2020: DELINQUENCY PETITION ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

5/27/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

HOME DETENTION CONTRACT ( V )

5/26/2020: HOME DETENTION CONTRACT ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

5/26/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT. ATTY G. MIRANDA AND ASA S. SCOTT WAS PRESENT VIA ZOOM. CASE SET FOR CHANGE OF PLEA ON 03/02/2021 AT 9:00 AM. DB/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCHANGE OF PLEA HEARING SET FOR 03/02/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCHANGE OF PLEA HEARING SET FOR 02/15/2021 AT 9:55 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY COURT PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MIRANDA, GINGER A - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002238 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. CARSON, GREGORY J - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-1/20/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDJJ FACE SHEET FOR SCORING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDJJ ASSESSMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDETENTION ORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: WELLS, CARLOS LEE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDETENTION HEARING SET FOR 05/25/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN 1A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: MEADOWS, ROBERT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MEADOWS, ROBERT B: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/26/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CJ000327 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN