Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 06/08/2020 at 01:24:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CARSON, GEORGIA ANN

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CARSON, GEORGIA ANN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CARSON, GEORGIA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REID, KATY ELIZABETH

Defendant Attorneys

DIAZ, WENDY LEE

MOSLEY, IOLA T

KAPLAN, DAVID A

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN MAIL

3/18/2020: RETURN MAIL

ORDER TO CONTINUE

3/17/2020: ORDER TO CONTINUE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/17/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/6/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

3/3/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/20/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

2/20/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

2/20/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

2/19/2020: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

2/18/2020: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

2/4/2020: ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )

RETURN MAIL (DEFENDANT) ( V )

1/22/2020: RETURN MAIL (DEFENDANT) ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

12/16/2019: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

12/18/2019: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

12/18/2019: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

11/26/2019: NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - B; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 3C - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - B; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 3C - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY COURT PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: KAPLAN, DAVID A; RICHARDSON, CALVIN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019MM002766 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. CARSON, GEORGIA ANN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/2/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - B SET FOR 06/11/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - B; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 3C - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCAPIAS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCAPIAS STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: REID, KATY ELIZABETH ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 12/17/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/26/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019MM002766 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REID, KATY ELIZABETH