This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/24/2020 at 03:10:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CANNON, CODY TYLER

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CANNON, CODY TYLER. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SWEET, GARY L and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********55 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SWEET, GARY L

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CANNON, CODY TYLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN, ALISSA R

BALDREE, LINDA KAY

Defendant Attorney

RICHTER, RAINER WAYNE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

2/13/2018: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

CLERK CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

2/6/2018: CLERK CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

JUDICIAL NOTES

2/5/2018: JUDICIAL NOTES

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

2/5/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

TRANSFER ORDER ( V )

2/5/2018: TRANSFER ORDER ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/10/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/10/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/10/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

11/20/2017: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/17/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

11/16/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ( V )

11/8/2017: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY ( V )

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

11/3/2017: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

11/3/2017: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

11/3/2017: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: SWEET, GARY L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: DRUG COURT HEARING; Judge: LEVIN, STEVEN J; Location: Courtroom 3A - HC; Result: PLEA / ADMISSION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (893.147.1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: POSSESSION OF MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF CANNABIS (893.13.6A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDICIAL NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER ORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND 2017AA082162 (893.147.1-3) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND 2017AA082162 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND 2017BB000255 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/03/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF002955 A

    Read MoreRead Less