This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 08:27:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CAMPBELL, BOOKER

Case Summary

On 01/07/1999 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CAMPBELL, BOOKER. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MIDELIS, JAMES W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********33 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MIDELIS, JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CAMPBELL, BOOKER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2019

DocketAttorney ANDREW JOSEPH SHULTZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/1999

HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: MIDELIS, JAMES W; Location: Courtroom A - HC; Result: NOLLE PROSEQUI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/1999

DocketSURETY BOND BB811879 (843.02-2) RELEASED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/1999

DocketDEFT PRES APD NP IN CRT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/1999

DocketB/MAN & DEFT NOTIFIED OF CRT DATE 5-19-99

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/1999

DocketWARRANT RETURNED 04/19/99, SERVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/1999

DocketARREST AFFIDAVIT FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/1999

DocketGALLOTT BOND BB811879, $500 FOR 5-19-99

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/1999

DocketWARRANT ISSUED 01/07/99.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/1999

ChargeCharges; Count: 1; Description: RESISTING ARREST (843.02); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/1999

DocketWARRANT ISSUED - $500 BOND WARRANT AFFIDAVIT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less