Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 05:14:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CAMEAU, DOMINIQUE

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CAMEAU, DOMINIQUE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********34 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CAMEAU, DOMINIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

Defendant Attorney

WALSH, HAROLD CHRISTOPHER III

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE ( V )

11/14/2019: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4210.1996 / 4508811) ( V )

12/7/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4210.1996 / 4508811) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

12/5/2018: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

11/13/2018: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

11/6/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

11/6/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/5/2018: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/5/2018: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - DENIED INCOME EXCEEDS GUIDELINES ( V )

9/27/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - DENIED INCOME EXCEEDS GUIDELINES ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/27/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

9/25/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

INFORMATION ( V )

9/21/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/31/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

8/30/2018: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

8/30/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

8/29/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

8/29/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

8/29/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $178.00 RECEIPT #2019000089468 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2018MM002134 A VIA CORE103019.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000089468; Applied Amount; $178.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000076084; Applied Amount; $145.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $145.00 RECEIPT #2019000076084 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2018MM002134 A VIA CORE091619.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019000026524 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2018MM002134 A VIA CORE032819.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000026524; Applied Amount; $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000007116; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019000007116 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2018MM002134 A VIA CORE012519.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2018000097628; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC15185350 POSTED $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/29/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018MM002134 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLOMAN, FELICIA