This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/27/2020 at 07:39:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BURGESS, RIVER LEE

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BURGESS, RIVER LEE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********58 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BURGESS, RIVER LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN, ALISSA R

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

Defendant Attorneys

MIRANDA, GINGER A

MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH

PETERS, BRETT

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4351.2475 / 4646828) ( V )

11/27/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4351.2475 / 4646828) ( V )

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4351.2468 / 4646827) ( V )

11/27/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4351.2468 / 4646827) ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

11/20/2019: IN-COURT NOTES

PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

11/20/2019: PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/22/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/16/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

5/9/2019: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

5/8/2019: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

5/3/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

5/3/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

IN-COURT NOTES

4/17/2019: IN-COURT NOTES

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

4/11/2019: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

9/24/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

9/14/2018: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

9/11/2018: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION - NO SIGNATURE ( V )

9/7/2018: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION - NO SIGNATURE ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

9/6/2018: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

9/6/2018: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketAttorney FELICIA HOLLOMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketAttorney EDWARD JOSEPH MOSHER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4351.2475 / 4646828) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4351.2468 / 4646827) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CF002458 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BURGESS, RIVER LEE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CFNJ-11/27/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CF002458 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BURGESS, RIVER LEE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFJDGSENT-11/26/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: SWEET, GARY L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CHANGE OF PLEA ENTERED / SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - INSUFFICIENT INFORMATION - NO SIGNATURE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/06/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CF002458 A

    Read MoreRead Less