This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/22/2020 at 11:28:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BRYANT, DEMETRIS DASHON

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRYANT, DEMETRIS DASHON. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********10 A

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BRYANT, DEMETRIS DASHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEDGES, SARA

Defendant Attorney

PACKARD, MARK

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4237.492 / 4535681) ( V )

2/27/2019: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4237.492 / 4535681) ( V )

NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

2/12/2019: NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

AMENDED IN-COURT NOTES ( V )

7/20/2018: AMENDED IN-COURT NOTES ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

7/18/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/30/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/23/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/12/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

10/10/2017: NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

BENCH WARRANT

9/20/2017: BENCH WARRANT

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/18/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

6/20/2017: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

6/6/2017: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

6/6/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

6/5/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

6/3/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

5/15/2017: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

5/15/2017: NONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000014221; Applied Amount; $178.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $178.57 RECEIPT #2020000014221 RECEIVED FOR ACCOUNT NUMBER 2017CF001310A VIA LGBSSLCPAYMENTS_02132020.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCASE PLACED WITH LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP IN FILE SlcLGBSPlacements_07182019.txt - BALANCE DUE $846.38.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 03/07/2019 - FAILED TO PAY $846.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4237.492 / 4535681) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4163.867 / 4464612) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60323095 POSTED $3,750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/15/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF001310 A

    Read MoreRead Less