This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/22/2021 at 12:56:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BRYANT, ANTDRAVIOUS DEON

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRYANT, ANTDRAVIOUS DEON. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BRYANT, ANTDRAVIOUS DEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

HOOPER, STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/20/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

12/17/2020: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

12/15/2020: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

12/2/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/16/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

11/16/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/12/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

11/12/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/2/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

11/2/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

11/2/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

10/8/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

10/7/2020: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/8/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/18/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GASKIN, VINCENT; MEREUS, WILSON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002228 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BRYANT, ANTDRAVIOUS DEON - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-2/24/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 04/20/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY DEFENSE MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT. PRESENCE WAIVED. APD S. HOOPER WAS PRESENT AND ASA S. SCOTT WAS PRESENT VIA ZOOM. DEFENSE MADE A MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR DOCKET CALL ON 4/20/2021 AT 9:00AM. MK/AP/DC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY COURT PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GASKIN, VINCENT; MEREUS, WILSON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002228 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BRYANT, ANTDRAVIOUS DEON - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-1/20/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 02/23/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5910855 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5910854 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002228 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN