This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/24/2020 at 10:29:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BROWN, JORDAN ELLIS

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BROWN, JORDAN ELLIS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********34 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BROWN, JORDAN ELLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LONG, WILLIAM CRAWFORD

DAY, JENNIFER LYNNE

Defendant Attorney

WATSON, ROBERT JAMES

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4213.1611 / 4511523) ( V )

12/14/2018: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4213.1611 / 4511523) ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

12/10/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )

12/10/2018: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

10/29/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

NOTICE ( V )

10/23/2018: NOTICE ( V )

NOTICE ( V )

9/20/2018: NOTICE ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/5/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/29/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/16/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION ( V )

7/10/2018: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION ( V )

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

7/10/2018: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

7/2/2018: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

6/20/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

6/20/2018: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

6/18/2018: CAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

6/15/2018: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

INFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

6/15/2018: INFORMATION AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

5/30/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4371.1162 / 4663995) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 2; Code: COP CF; Description: Cost of Prosecution; Assessment: $200.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 2; Code: COI; Description: Cost of Investigation; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount: Count: 2; Code: CF COST; Description: CF Court Cost; Assessment: $418.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE CHAIN OF CUSTODY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4213.1611 / 4511523) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: WATSON, ROBERT JAMES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CF003234 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BROWN, JORDAN ELLIS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFJDGSENT-12/12/2018"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSEARCH WARRANT AND INVENTORY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND PSC5042615 POSTED $30,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/04/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF003234 A

    Read MoreRead Less