This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 09:59:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BROWN, ARNEISHA A

Case Summary

On 06/23/2016 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BROWN, ARNEISHA A. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BROWN, ARNEISHA A

 

Court Documents

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

1/18/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

1/17/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/4/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

1/3/2017: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

12/21/2016: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/14/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

12/14/2016: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

12/13/2016: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/13/2016: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/9/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

12/9/2016: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

12/9/2016: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/7/2016: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/7/2016: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

12/6/2016: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

12/6/2016: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

12/6/2016: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-ORDER TO REVOKE BOND-NEW ARREST ( V )

12/6/2016: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-ORDER TO REVOKE BOND-NEW ARREST ( V )

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/23/2017

DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2017

DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: DOMINGUEZ, LIZET ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2017

HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 2E - HC; Result: NOLLE PROSEQUI OF CASE ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2017

ChargeCharges; Count: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT- 1 PRIOR (812.014.3B); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2017

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2017
View Court Documents

DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2017

DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL: (IN JAIL). APPEARED VIA JAIL VIDEO. WITH PRIVATE ATTORNEY MICHAEL R. OHLE, ASA FELICIA HOLLOMAN WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 PETIT THEFT- 1 PRIOR (812.014.3B) ASA ANNOUNCED A NOLLE PROSEQUIE IN OPEN COURT. FTA=DISMISSED**CT.1 NOLLE PROSEQUI, DECISION DATE: 1/18/2017,

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2017

HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - B; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 1D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2017
View Court Documents

DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2017

DocketCOURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL - B: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, WITH PRIVATE ATTORNEY MICHAEL R. OHLE, ASA FELICIA HOLLOMAN WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. THE DEFENDANT WAS SWORN, DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE. MOTION GRANTED. CASE SET FOR A STATUS WITH JAIL CASES.. DEFENDANT IS IN JAIL CONTINUED FOR: ARRAIGNMENT JAIL. NEXT COURT DATE: 1/18/2017 09:30 AM WITH JUDGE ISENHOWER D.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
07/18/2016

DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2016

HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 2C - HC; Result: CASE HEARD / NEW COURT DATE SET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2016
View Court Documents

DocketIN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2016

DocketCOURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, WITH APD PAUL B. BERNARD. ASA FELICIA HOLLOMAN WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. DEFENSE ENTERED A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY TO CT.1 PETIT THEFT- 1 PRIOR (812.014.3B) CONTINUED FOR: DOCKET CALL - A. NEXT COURT DATE: 8/16/2016 08:30 AM WITH JUDGE ISENHOWER D. DEFENDANT RECEIVED RETURN CARD. FOFAORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2016

DocketPROSECUTOR: HOLLOMAN, FELICIA ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2016
View Court Documents

DocketINFORMATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2016
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2016

DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 07/15/2016 AT 1:30 PM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2016

DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2016

DocketCASE FILED 06/23/2016 CASE NUMBER 2016MM001706 A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less