This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/14/2023 at 04:10:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BRADFORD, PAUL J JR

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRADFORD, PAUL J JR. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********36 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BRADFORD, PAUL J JR

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF PROBATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4927.126. / 5132924)

12/15/2022: ORDER OF PROBATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4927.126. / 5132924)

ORDER OF PROBATION

12/14/2022: ORDER OF PROBATION

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

11/17/2022: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

COURT MINUTES

11/15/2022: COURT MINUTES

PLEA AGREEMENT

11/15/2022: PLEA AGREEMENT

ORDER OF RESTITUTION

11/15/2022: ORDER OF RESTITUTION

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

11/15/2022: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

COURT MINUTES

11/8/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/2/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

COURT MINUTES

11/1/2022: COURT MINUTES

ORDER

10/26/2022: ORDER

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/22/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

COURT MINUTES

9/20/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

8/12/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE

8/12/2022: ORDER TO CONTINUE

MOTION TO CONTINUE

8/10/2022: MOTION TO CONTINUE

COURT MINUTES

7/22/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

7/22/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAttorney SPENCER ALLEN SCOTT - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAttorney CHRISTOPHER DEREK WALSH - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAttorney JEFF T GORMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAttorney ROBERT EUGENE STONE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4927.126. / 5132924)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HILBURN, MITCHELL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF001436 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BRADFORD, PAUL J JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-11/17/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS15560731 (440.105.4B2) RELEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: WALSH, CHRISTOPHER DEREK ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCAPIAS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCAPIAS STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS - SIGNED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCAPIAS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SIGNATURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/19/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF001436 A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less