This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/23/2020 at 02:12:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BOATWRIGHT, DAMIEN JERMAINE

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BOATWRIGHT, DAMIEN JERMAINE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SWEET, GARY L and ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********29 A

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SWEET, GARY L

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BOATWRIGHT, DAMIEN JERMAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

Defendant Attorneys

PETERS, BRETT

OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT AND CIVIL REGIONAL COUNSEL

SCHAEFER, CHRISTINE ROLEKE

KAPLAN, DAVID A

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (Other.4409.1136 / 4699057)

4/16/2020: CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (Other.4409.1136 / 4699057)

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4409.1131 / 4699056)

4/16/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4409.1131 / 4699056)

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC

4/14/2020: UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS

4/9/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

4/9/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

3/26/2020: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

PLEA AGREEMENT

3/24/2020: PLEA AGREEMENT

IN-COURT NOTES

3/24/2020: IN-COURT NOTES

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

2/27/2020: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ( V )

2/21/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ( V )

LETTER ( V )

1/6/2020: LETTER ( V )

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

1/13/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/7/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/7/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

INFORMATION ( V )

1/6/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

12/27/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

12/17/2019: WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/17/2019: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAttorney DAVID A KAPLAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAttorney FELICIA HOLLOMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAttorney CHRISTINE ROLEKE SCHAEFER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (Other.4409.1136 / 4699057)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4409.1131 / 4699056)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM COMMITMENT TO DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056201910731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/16/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CF003329 A

    Read MoreRead Less