This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/26/2020 at 11:49:34 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BLANK, STEPHEN NEIL

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BLANK, STEPHEN NEIL. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********77 A

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BLANK, STEPHEN NEIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN, ALISSA R

BRAUN, GAYLE DELMAN

HOLLOMAN, FELICIA

Defendant Attorneys

MIRANDA, GINGER A

MINTON, ASHLEY NICOLE

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4295.637 / 4592909) ( V )

7/15/2019: ORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4295.637 / 4592909) ( V )

ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

7/11/2019: ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

7/9/2019: NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

7/3/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

6/27/2019: IN-COURT NOTES

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

5/20/2019: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AMENDED) ( V )

4/10/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AMENDED) ( V )

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

4/10/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

ORDER ( V )

4/10/2019: ORDER ( V )

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

3/20/2019: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

3/19/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/14/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V )

12/5/2018: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

9/18/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

6/21/2018: CAPIAS ISSUED: ISS FROM DIRECT INFO

INFORMATION ( V )

6/21/2018: INFORMATION ( V )

IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

6/18/2018: IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

6/14/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION - Recorded (Other.4295.637 / 4592909) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF PROBATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4294.576 / 4591693) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4292.2777 / 4590453) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MINTON, ASHLEY NICOLE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CF001677 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BLANK, STEPHEN NEIL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CFNJ-7/9/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MINTON, ASHLEY NICOLE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018CF001677 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BLANK, STEPHEN NEIL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFJDGSENT-7/3/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR FINES FEES COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingEvent: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING; Judge: SWEET, GARY L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CHANGE OF PLEA ENTERED / SENTENCE IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 06/18/2018 AT 9:30 AM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM-WITNESS STATEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/04/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018MM001352 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less