This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/24/2020 at 07:39:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BETTENCOURT, MARK STEPHEN

Case Summary

On 11/22/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BETTENCOURT, MARK STEPHEN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SWEET, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********51 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SWEET, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BETTENCOURT, MARK STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LONG, WILLIAM CRAWFORD

DAY, JENNIFER LYNNE

Defendant Attorneys

ROSENBERG, REGAN M

CELIDONIO, MARY

RUIZ, ROBERT JASON

PACKARD, MARK

DOMINGUEZ, LIZET

 

Court Documents

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/2/2019: RETURN MAIL ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

9/27/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/25/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

9/18/2019: EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )

VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9/18/2019: VIOL OF PROBATION WARRANT RETURNED SERVED ( V )

VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT ( V )

8/19/2019: VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT ( V )

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DOC ( V )

6/12/2019: LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DOC ( V )

ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )

4/29/2019: ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/25/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/11/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

6/5/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RETURN MAIL ( V )

2/28/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

2/14/2018: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

1/12/2018: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

1/11/2018: IN-COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/11/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

RETURN MAIL ( V )

12/27/2017: RETURN MAIL ( V )

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • HearingEvent: VOP DOCKET HEARING; Judge: SWEET, GARY L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAttorney LIZET DOMINGUEZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketREMOVED PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE PER F.S. 939.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • HearingEvent: VOP ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: SWEET, GARY L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING WARRANT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY: DOMINGUEZ, LIZET ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketVOP DOCKET HEARING SET FOR 12/05/2019 AT 9:30 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SWEET, GARY L

    Read MoreRead Less
176 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS6K594991 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS6K594993 POSTED $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS15K246822 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS50K74262 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS50K74464 POSTED $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARY PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/22/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF003151 A

    Read MoreRead Less