Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 03:07:34 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BELIN, JOSHUA DAVID

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BELIN, JOSHUA DAVID. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********71 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BELIN, JOSHUA DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, REBECCA IVY

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION ( V )

4/13/2021: NO INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

4/5/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT - CRIMINAL TRAFFIC; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom 3C - HC; Result: NO INFORMATION OF CASE PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: CARRYING CONCEALED WEAPON (790.01.1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: WHITE, REBECCA IVY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT - CRIMINAL TRAFFIC SET FOR 04/27/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000671 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR BY LAW ENFORCEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, REBECCA IVY