This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/22/2021 at 12:28:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BARKER, JACQUELIN DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BARKER, JACQUELIN DANIELLE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********27 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BARKER, JACQUELIN DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONG, WILLIAM CRAWFORD

Defendant Attorney

HOOPER, STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

1/20/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

12/21/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

12/17/2020: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

12/15/2020: MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED ( V )

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

12/1/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/23/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/23/2020: NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

11/20/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

11/20/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/20/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

ORDER ( V )

10/19/2020: ORDER ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

9/24/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

9/24/2020: INFORMATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

9/18/2020: ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY COURT PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HILBURN, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002227 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BARKER, JACQUELIN DANIELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-1/20/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDOCKET CALL - PD SET FOR 02/23/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL - PD; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE CONTINUED BY STIPULATED MOTION PRIOR TO COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialOutstanding Amount; Code: PDAPP; Description: Public Defender Application; Assessment: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HILBURN, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002227 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BARKER, JACQUELIN DANIELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-12/17/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 10/22/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: LONG, WILLIAM CRAWFORD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS51363352 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002227 A

    Read MoreRead Less