This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/17/2021 at 12:09:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. AVERA, JAYDEN LLOYD

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against AVERA, JAYDEN LLOYD. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********49 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

AVERA, JAYDEN LLOYD

 

Court Documents

RETURN MAIL ( V )

11/13/2020: RETURN MAIL ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

11/2/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

11/2/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

NO INFORMATION ( V )

11/2/2020: NO INFORMATION ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

10/10/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

10/10/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 2; Description: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF-$1000 OR MORE (806.13.1A); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY (784.03.1); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: Dropped / Abandoned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DEPALMA, JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002249 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. AVERA, JAYDEN LLOYD - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-11/2/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS3K440589 (806.13.1A-2) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS1K525937 (784.03.1-3) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS3K440589 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT ISSUED: WARRANT OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketWARRANT NUMBER: 19056202014011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketARREST WARRANT STATUS CHANGED TO SENT TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE SECURED FOR ACTIVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketWARRANT/SWORN COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002249 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant