This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/31/2021 at 18:18:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ALGARIN, ANTHONY J

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALGARIN, ANTHONY J. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********29 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ALGARIN, ANTHONY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

MCENERY, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

JURY VERDICT ( V )

2/22/2021: JURY VERDICT ( V )

JUDGMENT OF NOT GUILTY - Recorded (Other.4560.1526 / 4822598) ( V )

2/23/2021: JUDGMENT OF NOT GUILTY - Recorded (Other.4560.1526 / 4822598) ( V )

IN-COURT NOTES

2/22/2021: IN-COURT NOTES

JUDGMENT OF NOT GUILTY

2/22/2021: JUDGMENT OF NOT GUILTY

ORDER ( V )

2/22/2021: ORDER ( V )

ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

1/19/2021: ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V )

WITNESS LIST ( V )

12/29/2020: WITNESS LIST ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

12/18/2020: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V )

12/2/2020: MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V )

MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V )

11/30/2020: MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V )

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

10/30/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

10/13/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

10/13/2020: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

10/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

9/21/2020: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

9/18/2020: ORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

9/18/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF NOT GUILTY - Recorded (Other.4560.1526 / 4822598) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Judge: ROBY, WILLIAM L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Count: 1; Description: AGGRAVATED BATTERY - PREGNANT (784.045.1B); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: ACQUITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIN-COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY VERDICT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF NOT GUILTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: PUSATERI, LINDA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CF002229 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ALGARIN, ANTHONY J - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-2/22/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSURETY BOND AS15K310733 POSTED $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE FORM--NO CONTACT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CF002229 A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, SPENCER ALLEN