This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/22/2020 at 00:05:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ADAMS, WILLIAM HUBERT

Case Summary

On 03/27/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ADAMS, WILLIAM HUBERT. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SWEET, GARY L and ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********22 A

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SWEET, GARY L

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ADAMS, WILLIAM HUBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAY, JENNIFER LYNNE

 

Court Documents

SURETY BOND X60321740 (322.34.2C) RELEASE PAID AMOUNT ($3750.00) BY PEREZ, CHRISTINA M

7/21/2017: SURETY BOND X60321740 (322.34.2C) RELEASE PAID AMOUNT ($3750.00) BY PEREZ, CHRISTINA M

RETURN MAIL ( V )

5/30/2017: RETURN MAIL ( V )

NOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE

5/22/2017: NOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

4/13/2017: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

NOTICE OF COURT DATE

4/5/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE

INFORMATION ( V )

4/4/2017: INFORMATION ( V )

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

3/28/2017: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

BOND RECEIVED ( V )

3/27/2017: BOND RECEIVED ( V )

NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

3/27/2017: NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE ROBY, WILLIAM L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A2AT4FP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60321740 (322.34.2C) RELEASE PAID AMOUNT ($3750.00) BY PEREZ, CHRISTINA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60321740 (322.34.2C) ESTREATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING; Judge: SWEET, GARY L; Location: Courtroom 2B - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A2AT4FP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - A2AT4FP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCITATION A2AT4FP FILED, OFFENSE DATE 03/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND RECEIVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketSURETY BOND X60321740 POSTED $3,750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SWEET, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/27/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CF000822 A

    Read MoreRead Less