This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 12/12/2022 at 07:33:59 (UTC).

ZAPATA, CARLOS vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 ZAPATA, CARLOS filed an Other lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0969

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZAPATA, CARLOS

ZAPATA, SANDRA

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4823.449. / 5037902)

5/12/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4823.449. / 5037902)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5/9/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

5/4/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/4/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT

3/30/2022: MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

2/16/2022: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

2/15/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED

2/14/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED

MOTION TO COMPEL

1/20/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAttorney LORA LIEB - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAttorney LORA LIEB - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketAttorney BARRY FISHMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4823.449. / 5037902)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMOTION HEARING SET FOR 05/10/2022 AT 10:20 AM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WEISSER, KEVIN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/04/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001676

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less