This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/07/2020 at 09:36:38 (UTC).

WYNNE BUILDING CORPORATION vs. RUGGIERO, MARIA C

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 WYNNE BUILDING CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RUGGIERO, MARIA C. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1255

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WYNNE BUILDING CORPORATION

Defendant

RUGGIERO, MARIA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELEZ, ANDRES

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

6/6/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

6/6/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

6/6/2017: CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

6/7/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

6/7/2017: CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

6/12/2017: ANSWER ( V )

ORDER SETTING HEARING ( V )

6/13/2017: ORDER SETTING HEARING ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

6/21/2017: COURT MINUTES ( V )

MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIP ( V )

6/29/2017: MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIP ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

6/30/2017: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - Recorded (Other.4014.2015 / 4325629) ( V )

6/30/2017: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - Recorded (Other.4014.2015 / 4325629) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney ANDRES VELEZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - Recorded (Other.4014.2015 / 4325629) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING STIP ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • HearingEvent: EVICTION HEARING; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketEVICTION HEARING SET FOR 06/21/2017 AT 9:30 AM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: VELEZ, ANDRES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CC001255, WYNNE BUILDING CORP. DBA SPANISH LAKES COMMUNITIES VS. RUGGIERO, MARIA C - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CERTMS-6/7/2017,SUMI-6/7/2017"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: VELEZ, ANDRES ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/06/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CC001255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017000043870 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 57397059 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170606235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYNNE BUILDING CORPORATION is a litigant